THE CORNERSTONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a Christian bookshop with books, bibles, bible notes, Christian artifacts etc. on sale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 14 January 1978: Standard registration
- THE CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Gary Brown | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Cooper | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Jackson | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ken Frazer | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev FERGUS TOM PEARSON WI | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.66k | £41.63k | £32.98k | £32.66k | £31.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.53k | £30.48k | £47.17k | £35.94k | £32.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.17k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE AREA OF WHITEHAVEN AND WEST CUMBRIA
Area of benefit
WHITEHAVEN AND WEST CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Kipling Avenue
High Harrington
Workington
CA14 4NF
- Phone:
- 07305 067780
- Email:
- margken09@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window