WORCESTER DRAGON BOAT RACING CLUB

Charity number: 1173247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit by the provision of facilities and training in Dragon Boat Racing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,427
Total expenditure: £6,070

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WDBRC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT EWELS Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
MAX ALLAN Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
NICOLA KAREN NORTH Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
KATALIN BABATUNDE-KELEN Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.78k £2.31k £1.73k £3.43k £5.43k
Total expenditure £18.64k £5.15k £3.19k £4.78k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Gregorys Bank
WORCESTER
WR3 8AQ
Phone:
07549405230
Email:
No information available