EVANGELINE 5775 UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangeline 5775 raises funds and offers support services for a safe house for sexually traficked girls in the Punjab, India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JAMES SIMCOCK | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Terence Malcolm Gently | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER JOHN NORRIS | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Rawcliffe | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £653 | £1.27k | £698 | £560 | |
|
Total expenditure | £280 | £459 | £500 | £1.77k | £580 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PUNJAB, INDIA; 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PUNJAB, INDIA; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PUNJAB, INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 TEMPLEWAY WEST
LYDNEY
GL15 5JD
- Phone:
- 07976956767
- Email:
- TERENCEGENTLY@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window