Accounts and annual returns BACK ON TRACK SUPPORTED ACCOMODATION
Charity number: 1172185

Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 March 2025 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2023 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2022 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2023 | 661 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 November 2022 | 737 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2023 | 1026 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window