BACK ON TRACK SUPPORTED ACCOMODATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty, hardship and distress and the relief of sickness among persons suffering the effects of substance abuse or dependency, by the establishment and support of a centre for support, advice, treatment and at the discretion of the trustees of accommodation for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 21 March 2017: CIO registration
- BACK ON TRACK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Paul Smith | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Philogene | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kirk Simpson | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Curry | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Dickinson | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 March 2025 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2023 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2022 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2023 | 661 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 November 2022 | 737 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2023 | 1026 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF A CENTRE FOR SUPPORT, ADVICE, TREATMENT AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES OF ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE IN NEED; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, AMONG THOSE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ON ALL ASPECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND ITS EFFECTS AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OR RETAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUFFERERS; 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF PROPERTIES OWNED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY BEING THOSE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY; AND 4) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONGST PERSONS SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THEIR REHABILITATION AND RECOVERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Cornwall Road
Bristol
BS7 8LH
- Phone:
- 07538 101842
- Email:
- chandosjames1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.