HOPE – South Yorkshire Fire-, Road- and Water-related Trauma Support for Families

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a support structure for people affected by a death or traumatic incident either within their family or through witnessing of a fire, road traffic collision (RTC) or drowning incident with trauma, and by responding to the emotional needs of people who have been affected by fire, RTC or drowning or incident causing trauma with charitable help and assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
- HOPE (Working name)
- HOPE- THE SOUTH YORKSHIRE FIRE & RESCUE AND RTC FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Steve Ayris | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Taylor | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Malyan | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Farouk Kardahji | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Oldroyd | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Deborah J Mathews | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Atkin | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.45k | £85.20k | £105.20k | £108.85k | £139.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £58.39k | £96.84k | £100.82k | £116.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2016 AMENDED ON 03 AUG 2017 AMENDED ON 08 JUL 2019 AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE (THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING A SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY A DEATH OR TRAUMATIC INCIDENT EITHER WITHIN THEIR FAMILY OF THROUGH THE WITNESSING OF A FIRE, ROAD TRAFFIC COLLISION (RTC) OR INCIDENT WITH TRAUMA AND BY RESPONDING TO THE EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY FIRE, RTC OR INCIDENT CAUSING TRAUMA WITH CHARITABLE HELP AND ASSISTANCE; (2) SETTING UP A SIGN-POSTING NETWORK OF SUPPORT AND PROVIDING INFORMATION THROUGH SEMINARS, CONFERENCES AND TRAINING EVENTS WHICH AIM TO ADDRESS THE EMOTIONAL TRAUMA SUFFERED BY PEOPLE THROUGH TRAUMA BY FIRE, RTC OR INCIDENT WITH TRAUMA; (3) WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH PROFESSIONAL AGENCIES, COMMUNITY OR VOLUNTARY NETWORKS AND OTHER CONCERNED ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO ASSIST THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY; AND (4) INCREASING COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PROMOTING SAFETY BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEED FOR HOME AND ROAD SAFETY, MANAGE RISK AND ON HOW TO STAY SAFE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Quadrant
99 Parkway Avenue
Sheffield
S9 4WG
- Phone:
- 0114 227 0105
- Email:
- info@hope-sy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window