Accounts and annual returns WHITE ELEPHANT

Charity Number: 1168105
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 06 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 06 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 06 July 2018 13 November 2019 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 July 2018 13 November 2019 191 days late