WHITE ELEPHANT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
White Elephant exists to promote greater understanding and support of teenage mental health at home, in school and in the community at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/07/2017 | 06/07/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 July 2018 | 13 November 2019 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2018 | 13 November 2019 | 191 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF TEENAGERS LIVING WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · THE PROVISION OF AN ONLINE GATEWAY TO TARGETED SUPPORT · THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS THAT ADDRESS CHILD MENTAL HEALTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window