RIDGEWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a church; Advancing the Christian faith; relieving those in need / in hardship / who are sick; benefitting the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £3,059 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Waltham Forest
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 June 2016: CIO registration
- RIDGEWAY CHURCH CHINGFORD (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL PETER TAYLOR | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Hermes | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICKY COULSON | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER KEITH BACON | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.90k | £97.41k | £46.59k | £37.09k | £50.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.81k | £69.70k | £36.22k | £15.59k | £45.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
[A] TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; [B] TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND [C] TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIDGEWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
E4 6PU
- Phone:
- 02085241410
- Email:
- ridgewaychurche4@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window