STRATFORD SHARKS SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities, teaching & coaching for Competitive Swimming, Water Safety and the opportunity to participate in related Aquatic Events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 March 2016: CIO registration
- STRATFORD SHARKS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darryl Skinner | Chair | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Partington | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Evans | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.23k | £86.62k | £111.70k | £137.96k | £157.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.34k | £70.13k | £125.67k | £141.76k | £144.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, TEACHING & COACHING FOR COMPETITIVE SWIMMING, WATER SAFETY AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO PARTICIPATE IN RELATED AQUATIC EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Murphy Salisbury Limited
Celixir House
Stratford Bus and Tech Park
Banbury Road
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwicks
- Phone:
- 07976041002
- Email:
- membership@teamsharks.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window