Financial history WOODFORD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1164203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.39k £13.30k £4.62k £17.77k £29.08k
Total expenditure £17.39k £7.94k £10.92k £32.36k £17.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A