Accounts and annual returns FREDDY FIT COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1168244
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1555 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1555 days