WESTBURY PARK SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitate Acts of Public Worship. Promotes the Philosophy of SNU Spiritualism by the holding workshops/seminars on Spiritualism including training in the different forms of Mediumship, including Spiritualist Healing. Hold Open Days, Special Demonstrations of Mediumship, Healing Sessions. We also raise funds for local groups which are run by volunteers in in our area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 02 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MINISTER MARIAN BISHOP | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Summerhayes | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MELISA JERMIN | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL McDONNELL | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MCNAB | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE KNOWLSON | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANE RIDLER-DUTTON | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
gillian grimson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIANNE WILSON | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.95k | £4.84k | £5.10k | £11.83k | £14.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | £6.74k | £4.75k | £9.02k | £11.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westbury Park Spiritualist Church
Cairns Road
Westbury Park
BRISTOL
BS6 7TH
- Phone:
- 07796690326
- Email:
- mw@protocolpr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window