Trustees EXETER SPIRITUALIST CENTRE AND HEALING GROUP

Charity number: 1164187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ronald Edward Miles Chair 12 December 2020
None on record
Phil Carrington Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Simon Goldstien Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Belinda Eaton Trustee 22 September 2024
None on record
Sheryl Lee Richards Trustee 15 July 2023
None on record
Susan Patricia Ward Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
Kaye Adams Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record