Financial history AIREBOROUGH VOLUNTARY SERVICES TO THE ELDERLY (AVSED)

Charity number: 1165792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £238.43k £275.65k £233.24k £238.01k £398.38k
Total expenditure £209.97k £211.18k £256.13k £286.07k £319.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £85.96k
Income from government grants £96.38k £127.75k £94.53k £98.56k N/A