Trustees AIREBOROUGH VOLUNTARY SERVICES TO THE ELDERLY (AVSED)
Charity number: 1165792

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine O'Brien | Chair | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gray | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Doubtfire | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Naylor Latty | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Bower | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Pearce | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Blanshard | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hanson | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEN ELLIOTT | Trustee | 11 October 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.