THE FRY ART GALLERY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1167717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Gallery, built in 1856 and substantially extended in 2021, houses a unique collection of works by 20th C artists who have lived in N.W. Essex, eg. Edward Bawden, Eric Ravilious, Michael Rothenstein. Other contemporary works are included to demonstrate the area's continuing artistic tradition. Over forty artists are represented in the Collection - owned by The N. W. Essex Collection Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £159,623
Total expenditure: £133,724

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2016: CIO registration
  • 03 February 2017: Funds received from 295904 FRY ART GALLERY SOCIETY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID OELMAN Chair 19 February 2025
None on record
Jules Francesca Teal Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Jason Cowley Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Simon John Gough Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Emily Beatrice May Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Candida Ann Clark Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
Maureen Alexandra Johnston Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
Nicola Jane Stratton Tyler Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
PHILIP JOHN NEALE Trustee 05 June 2017
None on record
NIGEL DAVID WARWICK WEAVER Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
FANNY HAINE Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
MARTIN HAROLD GRUSELLE Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
IRIS GWENDOLINE WEAVER Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
GORDON ISON CUMMINGS Trustee 20 June 2016
MUSEUMS ESSEX
Received: On time
JOHN STAFFORD READY Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
JENNIFER ANN CUMMINGS Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £262.45k £328.35k £219.12k £146.28k £159.62k
Total expenditure £66.78k £326.47k £443.75k £159.40k £133.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.86k £14.10k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 16 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 16 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Fry Art Gallery
19A Castle Street
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB10 1BD
Phone:
01799513779