BRADICAL EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BRADICAL Employment Rights CIO provides free advice and support in Birmingham on employment matters such as dismissal, unpaid wages or holiday pay, discrimination on grounds of pregnancy, disability, race, sex etc. Email address: bradicalemploymentrights@gmail.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 April 2016: CIO registration
- BRADICAL (Working name)
- BRADICAL EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurpreet Rheel | Chair | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Nyarko Komeng | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Usha Khera | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.14k | £6.38k | £11.10k | £21.76k | £32.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30k | £990 | £63 | £9.43k | £15.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE ON EMPLOYMENT MATTERS TO PERSONS WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bradical Employment Rights
Room 118, Gazette Buildings
168 Corporation Street
BIRMINGHAM
B4 6TF
- Phone:
- 07723 204253
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window