THE GUNNERSBURY MUSEUM AND PARK DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's role is to support the preservation, conservation and interpretation of the Museum collections, historic buildings and landscape of the Gunnersbury estate for the public benefit, to help develop the museum service and to support the provision of sporting and leisure facilities for the enjoyment and benefit of all. Our current activities involve raising funds for the regeneration scheme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,442,384
Donations and legacies | £7.96k | |
Charitable activities | £1.04m | |
Other trading activities | £1.40m | |
Investments | £254 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,346,548
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.30m | |
Other | £43.17k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £605,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £43.17k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.30m | |
Retained for future use | £95.84k |
People

42 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Hounslow
Governance
- 10 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor James Donald Knowles | Chair | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna McKelvey | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Salman Shaheen | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Hutchinson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Dominy | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hiren Dhimar | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sacha Rathore | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Zoe Ball | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Yvonne Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
HOWARD WILLIAM SIMMONS | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
KEVIN MAHONEY | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £27.11k | £9.54k | £2.40k | £2.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.38k | £12.46k | £19.75k | £15.09k | £2.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £605.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.04m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £254 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.17k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.74k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.22m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 February 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 February 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUL 2014 as amended on 26 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
4.1 THE COMPANY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE GUNNERSBURY MUSEUM AND THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND INTERPRETATION OF THE GUNNERSBURY MUSEUM COLLECTIONS,AND THE HISTORICAL BUILDINGS AND LANDSCAPE WITHIN THE GUNNERSBURY PARK; AND/OR 4.1.2 ENHANCE THE PROVISION OF BOTH INDOOR AND OUTDOOR FACILITIES IN GUNNERSBURY PARK IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SPORTS, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND/OR 4.1.3 PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE (TOGETHER THE “OBJECTS”).
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Large Mansion and Museum
Gunnersbury Park
Popes Lane
W3 8LQ
- Phone:
- 02039610280
- Email:
- info@gdt.org.uk
- Website:
-
gunnersburytrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window