Financial history ISLE RESCUE

Charity number: 1165676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.85k £13.05k £23.17k £13.63k £12.61k
Total expenditure £7.88k £11.53k £17.83k £18.43k £11.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A