Financial history THE MILITARY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1165473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84 £1.00k £0 £289 £350
Total expenditure £102 £69 £221 £73 £73
Income from government contracts N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A