THE MILITARY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and Preservation of Military Vehicles and Equipment Organisation of Military Vehicle Shows and support of Military Museums and Charities and their shows and demonstrations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 February 2016: CIO registration
- M.E.T. (Working name)
- MILITARY EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Rodney Haws | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roland Stephen Phillips | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby John Piers Milton | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Hugh Campbell | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Layton | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LACEY | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
TERRY LACEY | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84 | £1.00k | £0 | £289 | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £102 | £69 | £221 | £73 | £73 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY OF MECHANISED WARFARE BY: A) THE RESTORATION, REPAIR, PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY OF MILITARY VEHICLES AND ASSOCIATED ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT; B) THE ORGANISATION OF MILITARY SHOWS AND RE-ENACTMENTS INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF OTHER SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF MILITARY VEHICLES AND ASSOCIATED ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT; AND C) THE ORGANISATION OF EDUCATIONAL VISITS TO MUSEUMS; MILITARY ESTABLISHMENTS AND OTHER PUBLIC VENUES. 2) TO SUPPORT REGISTERED CHARITIES CONNECTED TO THE ARMED FORCES BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR PURPOSES AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Canterbury Avenue
Southampton
Hampshire
SO19 1EB
- Phone:
- 02380434703
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window