AUNTY RUTH'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Vision is to see impoverished young people in Israel have equal opportunities to bloom and reach their full potential in Education Health General well-being
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Torfaen
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 09 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JANE ELIZABETH JONES | Chair | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Owbunmi Awosemo | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR PAUL THOMAS GODDARD | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.02k | £24.48k | £27.19k | £24.98k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.90k | £14.00k | £17.60k | £23.33k | £20.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | £7.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN ISRAEL AND THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AUNTY RUTH'S CHARITY SHOP
10 Fairwater Square
Fairwater
CWMBRAN
NP44 4TA
- Phone:
- 08006446561
- Email:
- aunty.ruths@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window