Accounts and annual returns COVENTRY KERALA COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1165748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2021 226 days late Download Open in new window