COVENTRY KERALA COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARTS/CULTURE/HERITAGE/SCIENCE PEOPLE OF A PARTICULAR ETHNIC OR RACIAL ORIGIN AMATEUR SPORT ECONOMIC/COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT/EMPLOYMENT HUMAN RIGHTS/RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY/EQUALITY OR DIVERSITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgekutty Thomas | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Polachan Madan Poulose | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Yohannan | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tajmon Thomas | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulson Mathai | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johnson Puliparathadathil Yohannan | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.06k | £598 | £11.14k | £20.69k | £47.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.40k | £226 | £5.90k | £18.77k | £42.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE WORK OF CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING UNDER THE FOLLOWING DESCRIPTIONS OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN S. 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF EXPATRIATES FROM THE STATE OF KERALA, IN INDIA, NOW LIVING IN COVENTRY, WARWICK, LEAMINGTON AND RUGBY AND OTHER EXPATRIATE COMMUNITIES FROM KERALA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD: - THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP, THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION, THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING WHERE TO DO SO FURTHERS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE, THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING, THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF CHARITIES CONCERNED WITH SOCIAL INVESTMENT); - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; - THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OR SCIENCE; - THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT (AMATEUR SPORT BEING SPORTS OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION); - THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND - THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES (IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH CLOTHING AND OTHER ESSENTIALS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Cressage Road
COVENTRY
CV2 2DD
- Phone:
- 07888802502
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window