JO'S APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jo?s Appeal has benefited from many donations and fund-raisers: Coffee mornings, afternoon teas, craft fairs. Fund-raising at Jo's employer the NW Evening Mail. Barrow Amateur Boxing Club fight night. Live Like Jo 2016 calendar. RL pro Liam Harrison's testimonial fund. Football match. Running challenges. Pop Into Christmas concert. Christmas carol service. Go for Jo fell walks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MATT DAVIES | Chair | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAM DUKE | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NORMA HALPIN | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/10/2019 | 03/10/2020 | 03/10/2021 | 03/10/2022 | 03/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.49k | £4.30k | £725 | £2.43k | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.76k | £12.80k | £600 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 October 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2019 | 25 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NO LIMITED TO THE RESEARCH, RELIEF, CARE AND SUPPORT IN RELATION TO CANCER ILLNESS, THROUGH SUPPORTING THREE CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS (FURNESS GENERAL HOSPITAL ONCOLOGY UNIT, ST MARY'S HOSPICE, ULVERSTON, CUMBRIA AND THE EVE APPEAL). IN ADDITION TO THESE CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ALREADY ESTABLISHED, THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE WILL INCLUDE SUPPORTING OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR CHARITIES THAT IT SEES FIT THAT SUPPORT THE RESEARCH, RELIEF, CARE AND SUPPORT IN RELATION TO CANCER ILLNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Hector Street
Barrow-in-Furness
LA13 9NA
- Phone:
- 07771832749
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window