EMPOWER INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training and equipping men and women from poor and marginalised communities in Romania, with various skills to help them become employable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
- Australia
- Romania
- United States
Governance
- 02 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDY SUE SIMPSON | Chair | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIE CLAIRE ROGERS | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP IAN EDMUNDSON | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.15k | £8.55k | £1.68k | £820 | £820 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.20k | £7.66k | £1.43k | £650 | £738 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO THOSE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED TO PROVIDE THEM WITH THE SKILLS TO IMPROVE THEIR EMPLOYABILITY. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND THE ASSOCIATED SUPPORT SERVICES, SUCH AS ADVICE, COACHING AND MENTORING, TO ASSIST INDIVIDUALS TO HELP THEMSELVES IN ORDER TO ENABLE THOSE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Normandy Road
Hilton
DERBY
DE65 5GW
- Phone:
- 07528676821
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window