FAIRLIFE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The FairLife Charity is a fair trading initiative, designed to benefit everyone in the UK by improving everyday financial products and educating the public. The charity is applying the principle of fair trading to the finance institutions of Britain; awarding its trademark logo, the FairLife Mark, to qualifying companies and to groups that promote financial resilience and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 January 2016: Standard registration
- FAIRLIFE CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Peter Hallamore Entwisle | Chair | 04 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Noreen Siddiqui | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Bennett OBE | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Buchanan | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Kellie | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Berkley | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JOHN SHEERMAN MP | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|||||
AMY WASHINGTON | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA BOSCOTT | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £250 | £360 | £610 | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £107 | £107 | £307 | £207 | £922 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF RESPONSIBLE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR FINANCIAL AFFAIRS WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO DEBT, SAVING AND PENSION PLANNING. (B) TO PREVENT FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND REDUCE THE PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH DEBT BY WORKING WITH ORGANISATIONS TO ADOPT PRACTICES WHICH STRENGTHEN FINANCIAL RESILIENCE AND AID THE FINANCIALLY VULNERABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40a The Grove
Brookmans Park
Hatfield
AL9 7RN
- Phone:
- 07769693513
- Email:
- info@fairlife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window