ASHFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services of Christian worship and instruction, Bible study groups, Ladies Fellowship, Coffee and chat for vulnerable people,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 13 January 2016: CIO registration
- FRANCIS ROAD EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- THE ASHFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN HENRY CARTER | Chair | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Afolorunsho Oladipupo Fatola | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oleksandr Trokhymenko | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Mouncher | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Trokhymenko | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Hill | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Adsett | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST MICHAEL BATE M.A., M.SC | Trustee | 13 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN HULBERT B.A.HONS | Trustee | 13 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.78k | £85.04k | £49.04k | £58.72k | £74.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.92k | £54.03k | £46.98k | £54.62k | £71.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £10.00k | N/A | £1.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jan 2016 as amended on 22 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ASHFORD AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashford Community Church
Gospel Hall
Francis Road
ASHFORD
Kent
TN23 7UR
- Phone:
- 01233332248
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window