Trustees ASHFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1165151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN HENRY CARTER Chair 13 June 2023
None on record
Afolorunsho Oladipupo Fatola Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Oleksandr Trokhymenko Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Miriam Mouncher Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Susanne Trokhymenko Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Christopher Mark Hill Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Gill Adsett Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
ERNEST MICHAEL BATE M.A., M.SC Trustee 13 December 2015
None on record
MAUREEN HULBERT B.A.HONS Trustee 13 December 2015
None on record