PLAYFUL FOUNDATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playful Foundations works to remove barriers and support children's access and opportunity ot play. Playful Foundations through advocacy, training and awareness raising supports those who have a responsibility for children to adopt a playwork approach.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Trafford
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE DESSINGTON | Chair | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GREG IVISON | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE IMPORTANCE OF PLAY AND THE SKILLS AND EXPERTISE REQUIRED TO SUPPORT THE TIME AND SPACE FOR CHILDREN’S PLAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White City Adventure Playground
Australia Road
White City
London
W12 7PH
- Phone:
- 02087490909
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window