VENTNOR SKATE PARK GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ventnor Skatepark Group provides, maintains and promotes positive use of skatepark facilities for the community of Ventnor and the surrounding area of the Isle of Wight. The charity encourages wheeled skatepark sports, such as that of skateboarding, stunt scooters, BMX, Inline skating to all ages and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 22 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CATTLE | Chair | 21 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Manda McGrory | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fred Leslie Woodworth | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOE THOMPSON | Trustee | 21 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77k | £9.09k | £1.04k | £343 | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £598 | £7.22k | £776 | £440 | £610 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 March 2023 | 420 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 March 2023 | 420 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF VENTNOR AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SKATEBOARDING, ROLLER BLADING, ROLLER SKATING AND SCOOTERS.
Area of benefit
VENTNOR AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Wight Trash 59 High Street
RYDE
Isle Of Wight
PO33 2RJ
- Phone:
- 07598133214
- Website:
-
ventnorskatepark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window