THE FORGET-ME-NOT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The distribution of food and clothing to the homeless
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN MCGOWAN | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN MCGOWAN | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
EZRA MCGOWAN | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £2.58k | £2.85k | £11.30k | £12.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85k | £2.35k | £2.75k | £11.00k | £12.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THE HOMELESS, REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING, BLANKETS, DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR SHOWERING AND AD-HOC SHELTER. PROVIDING HELP AND ADVICE ON AREAS TO PURSUE TO HELP TO RELIEVE THE SITUATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 ROYLE GREEN ROAD
MANCHESTER
M22 4LL
- Phone:
- 07879696601
- Email:
- emcgowan@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window