THE FRIENDS OF GRAHAM STREET PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Park Organisation Community kiosk Gardening Ad hoc community events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Islington
Governance
- 15 December 2015: CIO registration
- FROGS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Riebel | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stroud | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Wielandt | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Biavatti Sobrinho | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susha Ireland | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iona Akbar Khan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA SAVAGE | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335 | £6.82k | £3.47k | £2.94k | £7.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £781 | £2.53k | £5.69k | £2.76k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ISLINGTON, LONDON, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF GRAHAM STREET PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 99
Fable Apartments
261C City Road
LONDON
EC1V 1AP
- Phone:
- 000000
- Email:
- grahamstreetpark@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window