THE HOCHHAUSER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Declaration of Trust established a general charitable trust. The Trustees make regular donations to registered charities. The Trustees do not themselves intend to engage in charitable activities other than the making of charitable donations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £5,082
Total expenditure: £4,910

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 May 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Romain Hochhauser Chair 04 December 2015
AURORA ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
HAMBLEDON MUSIC
Recently registered
CATHERINE ELIZABETH ATKIN Trustee 24 December 2013
None on record
Dr ANTHONY RABIN Trustee 24 December 2013
ANGLO-ISRAEL ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Ian Anthony Burman Trustee 23 December 2013
H AND M CASTANG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RECYCLING OF USED PLASTICS LIMITED
Received: On time
SEA SANCTUARIES TRUST
Received: On time
The Lord Leonard and Lady Estelle Wolfson Foundation
Received: On time
M D C JENKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BRENDON HILLS CHARITY
Received: On time
CITY RUGBY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WOOSNAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WHERE I WANT TO LIVE
Received: On time
TUTOR THE NATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.03k £5.01k £5.00k £4.03k £5.08k
Total expenditure £22.18k £21.53k £12.10k £6.64k £4.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Essex Court Chambers
24 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3EG
Phone:
02078428000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available