NORFOLK AND NORWICH FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1164424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To run and support the annual arts festival in Norfolk and Norwich. To act as one of the Regional Bridge organisations to promote the Arts in education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2015: CIO registration
  • 04 May 2017: Funds received from 265118 NNF TRUST 2015
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Nicholas Laurence Ross Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
Paige Olivia Gouldthorpe Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Julia Elizabeth Carruthers Trustee 24 October 2023
HEART OF GLASS ST HELENS LIMITED
Received: 10 days late
Kate Heyman Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NORWICH HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Maanik Chadda Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Martin Ambrose Mitchell Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Marc David Naveed Jaffrey Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Christopher Sargisson Trustee 21 April 2020
None on record
Lucy Garland Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Christopher Yeates Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Corrienne Peasgood Trustee 05 November 2019
THE TEACHING AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.22m £1.86m £2.38m £2.45m £2.04m
Total expenditure £2.23m £1.65m £2.17m £2.68m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £11.16k N/A £50.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.47m £1.52m £1.79m £1.52m £1.38m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.65m £1.69m £2.06m £1.96m £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £145.11k £372 £48.85k £128.32k £117.16k
Income - Charitable activities £425.47k £111.64k £268.81k £358.86k £318.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.50k £2.72k £267 £287 £3.06k
Income - Other £0 £60.21k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.01m £1.52m £2.02m £2.48m £2.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £219.87k £126.12k £150.39k £198.84k £209.05k
Expenditure - Governance £21.86k £21.80k £22.23k £23.22k £25.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £62.10k £186.77k £189.55k £219.85k £87.54k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £11.03k £7.86k £163.12k £235.38k £216.47k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £843.98k £1.10m £1.12m £890.16k £596.87k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £151.59k £187.19k £141.47k £219.08k £140.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Norfolk & Norwich Festival Trust
The Guildhall
Gaol Hill
Norwich
NR2 1JS
Phone:
01603877750