Trustees ACTION TOGETHER CIO
Charity number: 1165512

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS CAMILLA GUERECA | Chair | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Widdup | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ashton | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aqub Nazir | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dewan Choudhury | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mina Patel | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naila Akhter | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAVED REHMAN | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Wiggans | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KENNETH MELLOR | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RICHARD YATES | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.