FRIENDS OF OLD DURHAM GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FUNCTION OF THE FRIENDS GROUP IS TO MAINTAIN, PRESERVE AND CONSERVE THE ORCHARD; BORDER AND PARTERRE PLANTING; AND LAWNED AREAS OF THESE 17TH CENTURY, AUTHENTICALLY PLANTED, RESTORED GARDENS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL. WE OPEN THE GARDENS TWICE A WEEK AND ARE INTENDING TO INCREASE THIS. WE INVOLVE THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGES AND BUSINESSES IN OUR WORK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £201 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 23 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy Brindle | Chair | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Mason | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WIECEK | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROBERTS | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LEE | Trustee | 18 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA LEE | Trustee | 18 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £1.48k | £4.55k | £3.87k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.66k | £3.52k | £7.04k | £5.85k | £8.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £201 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, WITHIN THE AREA KNOWN AS OLD DURHAM GARDENS IN DURHAM CITY (HEREIN AFTER KNOWN AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT), CONNECTED WITH THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSE WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Durham Moor Crescent
Durham
DH1 5AW
- Phone:
- 01915977493
- Email:
- olddurhamgardens@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window