THE BARDSEY ISLAND TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to preserve, protect and improve, for the benefit of the general public, the natural history,historical, archaeological and religious sites and other amenities of Bardsey Island. The Charity's vision is also for Enlli (Bardsey Island) to continue as the exemplar of Welsh island life that supports a vibrant island community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £131,477 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1978: Standard registration
- 12 August 2020: Funds received from 1141822 CARREG TRUST
- YMDDIRIEDOLAETH YNYS ENLLI CYF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alun Llwyd Jones | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|||||
David Giblin | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Ensyl Lewis | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Deryl Roberts | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Purdon | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Philip Dovener Owen | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alwyn Evans Jones | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dilwyn Morgan | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela June Tyne | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lona Williams | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hughes-Jones | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Wilcox | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.91k | £156.58k | £195.10k | £227.74k | £356.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.99k | £96.84k | £172.93k | £164.15k | £421.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.00k | £29.71k | £12.25k | £131.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE NATURAL HISTORY, HISTORICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND RELIGIOUS SITES AND OTHER AMENITIES OF BARDSEY ISLAND. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(A) TO (S))
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bardsey Island Trust
PO Box 79
PWLLHELI
LL53 9AT
- Phone:
- 07904 265604
- Email:
- post@enlli.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window