POACHING PREVENTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide national parks, reserves & partner NGOs with free anti-poaching support, including but not limited to: - UAVs with on-board sensors - Tactical ground control systems - Laptops, rechargeable batteries, solar charges - The basics - e.g. radios, handheld GPS, footwear, tents - Specialist training (The founder is currently in the SADC (on her own dime) building partnerships)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Deeney | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian William Brown | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEON DEBELL BSc. | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £97 | £175 | £239 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF RHINOS, ELEPHANTS AND OTHER ENDANGERED SPECIES IN THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHICH ARE AT RISK FROM POACHING, INITIALLY IN AFRICA BUT WITH THE VIEW TO EXTENDING TO OTHER CONTINENTS WHERE ENDANGERED SPECIES ARE THREATENED BY POACHING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PREDICTIVE ANTI-POACHING TECHNOLOGY, EQUIPMENT AND SPECIALIST TRAINING TO NATIONAL PARKS, RESERVES AND WILDLIFE CONSERVANCIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
INITIALLY IN AFRICA BUT WITH THE VIEW TO EXTENDING TO OTHER CONTINENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Nussey Avenue
Birstall
BATLEY
West Yorkshire
WF17 9QP
- Phone:
- +44 7476583463
- Email:
- info@poachingprevention.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window