SOUTHAMPTON DOING IT FOR THE KIDS

Charity number: 1165276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

All money we raise is used directly to help those who we are supporting, with specialist equipment, respite care, therapies, support for their specialist placements, and also for days out for the kids and their siblings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,293
Total expenditure: £17,584

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SDIFTK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirley Booth Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record
TONY GAILOR Trustee 20 January 2019
None on record
Eugene McManus Trustee 20 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.02k £7.95k £19.08k £17.88k £11.29k
Total expenditure £8.12k £12.62k £8.32k £21.19k £17.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 August 2023 668 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FLAT 5
49 OLD REDBRIDGE ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 0NN
Phone:
07811165295