Accounts and annual returns MONO -UK

Charity number: 1164656
Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days