TAVISTOCK MEMORY CAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tavistock Memory Cafe is a Charitable Incorporated Organisation based in Tavistock, Devon. The Cafe provides a range of activities for those living with dementia and offers sessions where carers can obtain support, advice and information. We are grateful for our excellent volunteers and we're always pleased to hear from more! We support other local Dementia Friendly initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 02 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM COILEY | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Hannaford Hirst | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Smith | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francine Paula Rees | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roger John BULL CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Helene Bailey | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|||||
HEATHER RAYNE | Trustee | 16 March 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £2.21k | £6.28k | £11.93k | £14.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.95k | £1.39k | £3.28k | £11.72k | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £500 | £712 | £1.12k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 02 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 23 AUG 2021 as amended on 01 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, TOGETHER WITH THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS, BY PROVIDING A RANGE OF SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES IN COOPERATION WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS IN WEST DEVON, INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS OF DEMENTIA, PROVIDING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE, THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS, AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey Surgery
28 Plymouth Road
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 8BU
- Phone:
- 07765644843
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window