THE CHELTENHAM CIVIC SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging high standards of execution for buildings and public spaces, conservation of the towns heritage, and discussion and understanding of our urban environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 April 2016: CIO registration
- 26 June 2018: Funds received from 234749 THE CHELTENHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Booton | Chair | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Shelmerdine | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Curran | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Bryson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Attenborough | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.90k | £24.90k | £10.26k | £4.38k | £10.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.93k | £29.33k | £28.62k | £23.02k | £30.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Apr 2016 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, URBAN DESIGN AND PLANNING OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND CARE OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT' IS CHELTENHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parmoor
26 Cambray Place
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire
GL50 1JN
- Phone:
- 07876766750
- Email:
- enquiries@cheltcivicsoc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window