Trustees THE CHELTENHAM CIVIC SOCIETY CIO

Charity number: 1166580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew William Booton Chair 17 March 2021
None on record
David Alan Shelmerdine Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Hugh Curran Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Sarah Anne Harvey Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Stephen James Bryson Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Claire Attenborough Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record