FOUR CROSSES VILLAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 13 February 1978: Standard registration
- THE FOUR CROSSES VILLAGE CENTRE COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lilian Eujenie Foulkes | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Davies | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR KEN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MALCOLM FOULKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.94k | £32.76k | £5.75k | £11.91k | £8.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.25k | £9.70k | £4.03k | £12.87k | £17.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.60k | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 July 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED 7 JANUARY 1976 AND 11TH OCTOBER 1977.
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LLANDYSILIO PARISH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND (AS ANCILLARY THERETO) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELAFER OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LLADYSILIO PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 4 FOXEN MANOR ROAD
FOUR CROSSES
LLANYMYNECH
SY22 6ND
- Phone:
- 01691831418
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window