HELP THE MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate a charity shop at 12-18 Dunstall Street, Scunthorpe, where we sell donated items to the general public. As well as operating as a retail shop, the premises are used to support service users, who use the shop as a drop in centre, we provide drinks, advice and support. We make donations to help people and organisations who suffer with or work in mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDY JANE MCDERMOTT | Chair | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TYMA | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.33k | £84.39k | £79.78k | £56.97k | £53.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.88k | £53.14k | £45.06k | £48.59k | £37.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.57k | £26.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH IN THE UK. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, SUPPORT AND DONATIONS TO CARERS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE FAMILY MEMBERS SUFFERING FROM A MENTAL DISORDER, OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS. TO PROVIDE DONATIONS TO ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE WORKING IN THE MENTAL HEALTH SECTOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12-18 Dunstall Street
Scunthorpe
DN15 6LF
- Phone:
- 07415115306
- Email:
- mandyjanemcdermott@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window