Accounts and annual returns MANGO TREE HOME LIMITED

Charity number: 1166666
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required