OAKLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oakley Community Association works in Oakley, Deane, Malshanger and Newfound, providing regular events for local residents, including a Sports Weekend; Fireworks; Litter Picks; Village Show and working with other village organisations. The organisation also acts as an information point through its website and weekly email newsletter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 January 2016: Standard registration
- OCA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGINA GRACE | Chair | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kristofor Bettridge | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Rowley | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Watson | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANN DAVIS | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Wheeler | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara June Bedford | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS TIFFANY WISE | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN GRACE ASKEW | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.99k | £240 | £14.73k | £11.30k | £11.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.60k | £6.06k | £8.08k | £12.20k | £12.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OAKLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY INCLUDING DEANE, MALSHANGER AND NEWFOUND (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, WHERE THE OPPORTUNITY ARISES, (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C)PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Kings Orchard
Oakley
Basingstoke
RG23 7AX
- Phone:
- 01256781456
- Email:
- ocaoakley@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window