Trustees SNYDALE RDA
Charity number: 1165459

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Bruce Ross | Chair | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Golding | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Horsfall | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ross | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Sidney Oselton | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stuart Megretton | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BULLOCK | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULA ELIZABETH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.